Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3727.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1934.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
Set for hearing August 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|