LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR60
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR60
Compare Versions
SCR60 Chaptered February 3, 2014
SCR60 Enrolled January 30, 2014
SCR60 Amended August 27, 2013
SCR60 Amended August 12, 2013
SCR60 Introduced July 8, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR60 Chaptered February 3, 2014
SCR60 Enrolled January 30, 2014
SCR60 Amended August 27, 2013
SCR60 Amended August 12, 2013
SCR60 Introduced July 8, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare