Assembly | 09/11/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2343.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1934.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/16/2013 | Set for hearing August 20. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |