LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR64
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR64
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR64
Compare Versions
SCR64 Chaptered February 6, 2014
SCR64 Enrolled February 3, 2014
SCR64 Amended January 14, 2014
SCR64 Amended August 22, 2013
SCR64 Introduced August 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR64 Chaptered February 6, 2014
SCR64 Enrolled February 3, 2014
SCR64 Amended January 14, 2014
SCR64 Amended August 22, 2013
SCR64 Introduced August 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare