Senate | 05/08/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 810.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1006.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | Read. Amended. (Page 921.) Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2013 | Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 89.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |