California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill May 8, 2013

Amended

Bill April 18, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013