Senate | 08/07/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 4294.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5703.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3593.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2014 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |