California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR86 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 5, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 7, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill May 21, 2014