California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR94 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2014

Chaptered

Bill May 5, 2014

Amended

Bill April 7, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014