LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR94
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR94
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR94
Compare Versions
SCR94 Chaptered May 5, 2014
SCR94 Enrolled May 1, 2014
SCR94 Amended April 7, 2014
SCR94 Amended March 24, 2014
SCR94 Introduced March 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SCR94 Chaptered May 5, 2014
SCR94 Enrolled May 1, 2014
SCR94 Amended April 7, 2014
SCR94 Amended March 24, 2014
SCR94 Introduced March 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare