Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2014
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2977.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|