California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR95 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/07/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 95CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 101 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 7, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 24, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Steinberg MARCH 6, 2014 Relative to the Kirk Breed Memorial Race Track. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 95, Steinberg. Kirk Breed Memorial Race Track. This measure would designate the State Fair Race Track located on the grounds of the California Exposition and State Fair in the City of Sacramento as the Kirk Breed Memorial Race Track. The measure would request the Board of Directors of the California Exposition and State Fair to determine the cost of placing an appropriate memorial plaque marking this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect that memorial plaque. WHEREAS, Kirk Eldridge Breed was born on November 16, 1939, in Choctaw, Oklahoma; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed, in his early life, developed a passion for horses through participation in their breaking, training, racing, and sale; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed began a long career in public service in 1963, when he was selected to the first class of President John F. Kennedy' s Peace Corps, serving four years in the Republic of Columbia, before being appointed Director of the Peace Corps in the Republic of Chile for five years; and WHEREAS, In 1979, Governor Edmund G. Brown, Jr. appointed Kirk Breed General Manager of the California Exposition and State Fair; and WHEREAS, Under Kirk Breed's leadership, the State Fair grew into one of the nation's premier agricultural events; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed continued his service to the state, serving eight years as a member of the Board of Directors of the California Exposition and State Fair; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed furthered his state service as a Senior Consultant to the Assembly Committee on Governmental Organization, where he drafted legislation relating to the horse industry; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed continued to demonstrate his passion and commitment to horses, horse racing, horse industry practices, and higher safety standards at racetracks as a lobbyist representing the Pacific Coast Quarter Horse Racing Association and Ray Cammack Shows, among other clients; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed again returned to state service as Executive Director of the California Horse Racing Board, and was widely known for his unshakeable efforts to improve the health and safety of racehorses across the state; and WHEREAS, Kirk Breed passed away on August 7, 2013, at 73 years of age, after a brave battle with cancer; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the California Legislature hereby designates the State Fair Race Track located on the grounds of the California Exposition and State Fair in the City of Sacramento as the Kirk Breed Memorial Race Track; and be it further Resolved, That the Board of Directors of the California Exposition and State Fair is requested, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering its cost, to place a memorial plaque marking this special designation; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Board of Directors of the California Exposition and State Fair and to the author for appropriate distribution.