Senate | 09/20/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/20/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 3003.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 1604.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2013 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |