LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR13
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR13
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR13
Compare Versions
SJR13 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SJR13 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SJR13 Amended September 9, 2013
SJR13 Amended June 10, 2013
SJR13 Introduced May 24, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SJR13 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SJR13 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SJR13 Amended September 9, 2013
SJR13 Amended June 10, 2013
SJR13 Introduced May 24, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare