Senate | 04/15/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:45 p.m. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 3130.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 52. Noes 14. Page 4360.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |