LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR18
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR18
Compare Versions
SJR18 Chaptered April 15, 2014
SJR18 Enrolled April 11, 2014
SJR18 Amended April 7, 2014
SJR18 Amended March 11, 2014
SJR18 Introduced January 16, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SJR18 Chaptered April 15, 2014
SJR18 Enrolled April 11, 2014
SJR18 Amended April 7, 2014
SJR18 Amended March 11, 2014
SJR18 Introduced January 16, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare