Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 116, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4469.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5847.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3162.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2014
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|