LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR19
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR19
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR19
Compare Versions
SJR19 Chaptered August 18, 2014
SJR19 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SJR19 Amended June 25, 2014
SJR19 Amended June 12, 2014
SJR19 Introduced March 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SJR19 Chaptered August 18, 2014
SJR19 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SJR19 Amended June 25, 2014
SJR19 Amended June 12, 2014
SJR19 Introduced March 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare