Senate | 09/06/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected August 28.) | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 578.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 569.) (April 16). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |