LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR7
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR7
Compare Versions
SJR7 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SJR7 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SJR7 Amended August 26, 2013
SJR7 Amended August 5, 2013
SJR7 Introduced March 13, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SJR7 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SJR7 Enrolled September 3, 2013
SJR7 Amended August 26, 2013
SJR7 Amended August 5, 2013
SJR7 Introduced March 13, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare