Senate | 09/10/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/10/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2170.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2013 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2013 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 27). | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 807.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |