LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR9
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SJR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SJR9
Compare Versions
SJR9 Chaptered September 10, 2013
SJR9 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SJR9 Amended September 3, 2013
SJR9 Amended August 29, 2013
SJR9 Amended August 5, 2013
SJR9 Amended April 25, 2013
SJR9 Introduced March 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SJR9 Chaptered September 10, 2013
SJR9 Enrolled September 9, 2013
SJR9 Amended September 3, 2013
SJR9 Amended August 29, 2013
SJR9 Amended August 5, 2013
SJR9 Amended April 25, 2013
SJR9 Introduced March 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare