|
09/27/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 6462.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5301.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 7. Page 1584.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|