LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1050
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1050
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1050
Compare Versions
AB1050 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1050 Amended February 10, 2016
AB1050 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1050 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1050 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1050 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AB1050 Amended February 10, 2016
AB1050 Amended July 7, 2015
AB1050 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1050 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare