|
09/22/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 443, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6283.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6114.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 4955.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 1588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|