LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1103
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1103
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1103
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2015
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
August 29, 2016
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 22, 2016
Compare
Amended
Bill
June 6, 2016
Compare
Bill
June 1, 2016
Compare
Bill
May 11, 2016
Compare
Bill
July 16, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 19, 2015
Compare