California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1182 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015