LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1182
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1182
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1182
Compare Versions
AB1182 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1182 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB1182 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1182 Amended August 18, 2015
AB1182 Amended May 5, 2015
AB1182 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1182 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1182 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1182 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1182 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB1182 Amended September 3, 2015
AB1182 Amended August 18, 2015
AB1182 Amended May 5, 2015
AB1182 Amended April 21, 2015
AB1182 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1182 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare