|
09/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 276, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2462.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1987.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1553.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|