California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 8, 2015

Amended

Bill June 24, 2015
Bill May 18, 2015