|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6041.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4987.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|