California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1217 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 9, 2015