Assembly | 04/28/2015 | From committee: That the measure be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2015 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2015 | Introduced. To print. |