LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1233
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1233
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1233
Compare Versions
AB1233 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1233 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1233 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1233 Amended April 15, 2015
AB1233 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1233 Amended August 1, 2016
AB1233 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1233 Amended January 4, 2016
AB1233 Amended April 15, 2015
AB1233 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare