|
09/30/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2915.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2920.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2482.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|