California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1259 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill June 24, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015