California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1277 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill April 29, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015