LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1277
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1277
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1277
Compare Versions
AB1277 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB1277 Enrolled August 27, 2015
AB1277 Amended April 29, 2015
AB1277 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1277 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1277 Chaptered October 11, 2015
AB1277 Enrolled August 27, 2015
AB1277 Amended April 29, 2015
AB1277 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1277 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare