California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1300 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill April 27, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015