LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1300
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1300
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1300
Compare Versions
AB1300 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1300 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1300 Amended April 27, 2016
AB1300 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1300 Amended January 25, 2016
AB1300 Amended May 20, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 13, 2015
AB1300 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1300 Amended June 21, 2016
AB1300 Amended June 16, 2016
AB1300 Amended April 27, 2016
AB1300 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1300 Amended January 25, 2016
AB1300 Amended May 20, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1300 Amended April 13, 2015
AB1300 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare