|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2859.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2862.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2432.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1435.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|