California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1310 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2015

Amended

Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 29, 2015