Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
Died on Senate inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3526.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|