California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016
Bill February 23, 2016
Bill January 26, 2016