Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 10. Page 3503.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/25/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3471.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|