California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 26, 2016
Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill January 25, 2016
Bill March 26, 2015