Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1814.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|