LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1383
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1383
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1383
Compare Versions
AB1383 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1383 Amended May 4, 2016
AB1383 Amended June 19, 2015
AB1383 Amended May 28, 2015
AB1383 Amended April 20, 2015
AB1383 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1383 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1383 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1383 Amended May 4, 2016
AB1383 Amended June 19, 2015
AB1383 Amended May 28, 2015
AB1383 Amended April 20, 2015
AB1383 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1383 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare