California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill July 15, 2015
Bill June 29, 2015
Bill March 5, 2015