LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB139
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB139
Compare Versions
AB139 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB139 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB139 Amended August 26, 2015
AB139 Amended July 15, 2015
AB139 Amended June 29, 2015
AB139 Amended March 5, 2015
AB139 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB139 Chaptered September 21, 2015
AB139 Enrolled September 3, 2015
AB139 Amended August 26, 2015
AB139 Amended July 15, 2015
AB139 Amended June 29, 2015
AB139 Amended March 5, 2015
AB139 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare